MO SB318 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates certain highways in the state
Title
Designates certain highways in the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-04-29 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2015-04-29 | House | S concurs in HA 2 |
2015-04-29 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2015-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2015-04-29 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(1685S01.02H) |
2015-04-29 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(1685S01.03H) |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Transportation Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 318-Cunningham and Libla |