MO SB306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 300 & 306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 300 & 306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the treasurer of a seven-director school district to use one or more sureties when entering into a bond to the state
Title
Authorizes the treasurer of a seven-director school district to use one or more sureties when entering into a bond to the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 300 & 306) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 306-Hegeman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57629291 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB306.pdf |