MO SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows evidence of failure to wear a seatbelt to prove comparative negligence, causation, absence of defect, and failure to mitigate damages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows evidence of failure to wear a seatbelt to prove comparative negligence, causation, absence of defect, and failure to mitigate damages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: SB 30 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSigned by Governor
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-04-30HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-04-30HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-04-30HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-25HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-17HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Judiciary
2019-03-11HouseH Second Read
2019-03-07HouseH First Read
2019-03-07SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-06SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-06SenatePerfected
2019-03-06SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-03-06SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0420S05.02S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0420S05.01F)
2019-03-06SenateSS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(0420S.05F)
2019-02-19SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-14SenateSCS Reported from S Government Reform Committee
2019-02-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0420S.04C)
2019-02-05SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 30-Hegeman
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback