MO SB293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the expiration date on the authority of certain public higher education institutions to transfer real property, except in fee simple, without General Assembly authorization
Title
Removes the expiration date on the authority of certain public higher education institutions to transfer real property, except in fee simple, without General Assembly authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 293-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=18179029 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB293.pdf |