MO SB292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 292-Eigel, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to charter schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to charter schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 292-Eigel, with SCS
2019-03-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-21SenateReported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS
2019-02-19SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1626S.02C)
2019-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2019-01-23SenateS First Read--SB 292-Eigel

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback