MO SB287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a process for reducing bias in policing
Title
Creates a process for reducing bias in policing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Re-referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 287-Nasheed |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57611626 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB287.pdf |