MO SB285 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 285 & 17-Koenig, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces the corporate income tax and makes modifications to several tax credit programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the corporate income tax and makes modifications to several tax credit programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 285 & 17-Koenig, with SCS
2017-03-29SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS
2017-02-07SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 285 & 17) Ways and Means Committee (0881S.06C)
2017-01-31SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2017-01-19SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2017-01-11SenateS First Read--SB 285-Koenig

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback