MO SB27 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability Committee
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability Committee
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to certified registered nurse anesthetists
Title
Modifies provisions relating to certified registered nurse anesthetists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |