MO SB268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 268-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 268-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics Fund and creates the Economic-Education Partnership Act
Title
Modifies the Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics Fund and creates the Economic-Education Partnership Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 268-Pearce, with SCS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1473S.02C) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 268-Pearce |