MO SB267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Executive Session Continued H General Laws - Action postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to the direct payment of health care providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to the direct payment of health care providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session Continued H General Laws - Action postponed
2019-05-07HouseExecutive Session Continued H General Laws - Action postponed
2019-05-06HouseExecutive Session Continued H General Laws - Action postponed
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session Continued - Action postponed
2019-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-09HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-03-27HouseH Second Read
2019-03-26HouseH First Read
2019-03-26SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-03-26SenateSCS S adopted
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent w/SCS
2019-02-20SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent vote adopted (0507S.02C)
2019-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (0507S.02C)
2019-02-13SenateHearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
2019-01-16SenateS First Read--SB 267-Wieland

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback