MO SB26 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to insurance coverage of pharmacy services
Title
Enacts provisions relating to insurance coverage of pharmacy services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |