MO SB26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 26 & 106-Wasson, with HA 1, HA 2 & HA 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 26 & 106-Wasson, with HA 1, HA 2 & HA 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the issuance of Nixa Education Foundation and Combat Action special license plates
Title
Allows for the issuance of Nixa Education Foundation and Combat Action special license plates
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 26 & 106-Wasson, with HA 1, HA 2 & HA 3 | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Kander)--(0191S02.04H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Denison)--(0191S02.05H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(0191S02.03H) | |
2011-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-14 | H First Read | |
2011-04-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-14 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-04-06 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-30 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 26 & 106) S Transportation Committee - (0191S.02C) | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 26-Wasson | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |