MO SB256 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child abuse and neglect including the Safe Place for Newborns Act
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child abuse and neglect including the Safe Place for Newborns Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] | Rep. Noel Torpey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | H submits CCR |
2013-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (1371S.05S) |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (1371S05.1SR) |
2013-05-15 | House | S conferees appointed: Silvey, Romine, Sater, Justus, Keaveny |
2013-05-15 | House | H conferees appointed: Torpey, Hinson, McManus |
2013-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-14 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-14 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(1371H04.01H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Allen)--(1371H04.03H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(1371H04.08H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 7 to SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(1371S02.05S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 6 to SCS S offered & adopted (McKenna)--(1371S02.06S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 5 to SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(8062S13.02S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(1371S02.01F) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(1371S02.03S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Silvey)--(1371S02.04S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Silvey)--(1371S02.02S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee - (1371S.02C) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 256-Silvey |