MO SB243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to educational resources and services
Title
Modifies provisions relating to educational resources and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS | |
2011-05-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-04-19 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-03-07 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-03 | H First Read | |
2011-03-03 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-02 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Perfected, as amended | |
2011-03-02 | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0249S04.08S) | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0249S04.05S) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-22 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-09 | S First Read--SB 243-Cunningham |