MO SB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Cunningham, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Cunningham, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a pupil to enroll in an adjoining school district if the student's residence is located closer to a school in the adjoining district or in cases of transportation hardship
Title
Allows a pupil to enroll in an adjoining school district if the student's residence is located closer to a school in the adjoining district or in cases of transportation hardship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Cunningham, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) | |
2011-03-30 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-30 | SS for SCS S offered (Cunningham)--(1307S.07F) | |
2011-03-16 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - (1307S.05C) | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-09 | S First Read--SB 242-Cunningham |