MO SB239 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a statutory cause of action for damages against health care providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a statutory cause of action for damages against health care providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HouseSigned by Governor
2015-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2015-04-22HouseSigned by House Speaker
2015-04-22HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2015-04-22HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2015-04-21HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2015-04-21HouseH Third Read and Passed
2015-04-16HouseReported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee
2015-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee
2015-04-15HouseReferred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12)
2015-04-15HouseReported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
2015-04-15HouseVoted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Committee
2015-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
2015-04-08HouseReferred H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
2015-03-16HouseH Second Read
2015-03-12HouseH First Read
2015-03-12SenateS Third Read and Passed
2015-03-10SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-03-10SenatePerfected
2015-03-10SenateSS, as amended, S adopted
2015-03-10SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(1309S06.05S)
2015-03-10SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(1309S06.02S)
2015-03-10SenateSS S offered (Brown)--(1309S.06F)
2015-03-05SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2015-03-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2015-02-24SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2015-02-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2015-01-14SenateS First Read--SB 239-Brown

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback