MO SB229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 229-Riddle, w/ HSA 1 for HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 229-Riddle, w/ HSA 1 for HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to working hours for employees at certain mental health facilities
Title
Modifies the law relating to working hours for employees at certain mental health facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 229 (HSA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 229 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 229 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 229 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 229 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 229-Riddle, w/ HSA 1 for HA 1 |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-12 | House | HSA 1 for HA 1 H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(0918S02.40H) |
2017-05-12 | House | HA 1 H offered (Fitzpatrick)--(0918S02.40H) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Not Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Not Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2017-03-06 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-01 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted (0918S.02C) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0918S.02C) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 229-Riddle |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |