MO SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various Supreme Court Rules relating to discovery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various Supreme Court Rules relating to discovery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 224 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseS concurs in HCS
2019-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseHCS H adopted
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-05-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-05-09HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2019-05-07HouseReferred H Judiciary
2019-05-07HouseH Second Read
2019-05-06HouseH First Read
2019-05-06SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-06SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-05-06SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-05-02SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-05-02SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-05-01SenatePerfected
2019-05-01SenateSS#4 S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0633S.12F)
2019-05-01SenateSS#3 S withdrawn
2019-05-01SenateSA 1 to SS#3 S offered (Rizzo)--(0633S09.01F)
2019-05-01SenateSS#3 S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(0633S.09F)
2019-05-01SenateSS#2 S withdrawn
2019-03-27SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-27SenateSS#2 S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(0633S.08F)
2019-03-27SenateSS S withdrawn
2019-03-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-11SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0633S07.02S)
2019-03-11SenateSS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(0633S.07F)
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 224-Luetkemeyer
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1055374
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB224.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB224.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0224.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB224.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay620506986-1026.pdf#989
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.027.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1680
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1679
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1680
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1679

Bill Comments

feedback