MO SB220 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies liens for certain design professionals and the statute of limitations for actions against land surveyors
Title
Modifies liens for certain design professionals and the statute of limitations for actions against land surveyors
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | No motion made to override Governor's veto | |
2011-07-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-11 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-11 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Motion to Dissolve Conference Committee S adopted | |
2011-05-09 | H conferees appointed: Diehl, Elmer, Korman, Kelly-24, Carlson | |
2011-05-09 | S conferees appointed: Wasson, Richard, Parson, Callahan, Justus | |
2011-05-05 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-05 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-05 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Elmer)--(1039L02.01H) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-04-20 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Perfected | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-08 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-07 | S First Read--SB 220-Wasson |