MO SB22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to contaminated homes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to contaminated homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 79 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 22 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 79 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Defeated on H Third Reading |
2017-05-12 | House | HCS H adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Matthiesen)--(0608H13.17H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Budget |
2017-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Budget |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Budget |
2017-04-13 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-12 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0608S.03F) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Enviornment Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 22-Chappelle-Nadal |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |