MO SB217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 217-Nasheed, with HA 1, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 217-Nasheed, with HA 1, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds donations to soup kitchens or homeless shelters to current tax credit for donations to food pantries
Title
Adds donations to soup kitchens or homeless shelters to current tax credit for donations to food pantries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 217 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 217-Nasheed, with HA 1, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(0909S04.12H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered (Fitzpatrick)--(0909S04.10H) |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-03-06 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-01 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Economic Development Committee - Consent vote adopted (0909S.04C) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (0909S.04C) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 217-Nasheed |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |