MO SB214 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to crime
Title
Modifies provisions relating to crime
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 214-Silvey |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17565913 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB214.pdf |