MO SB213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts new provisions relating to the nonpartisan state demographer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts new provisions relating to the nonpartisan state demographer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 213 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-07HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-10HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-04-01HouseH Second Read
2019-03-28HouseH First Read
2019-03-28SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-28SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-03-28SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-03-14SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-03-14SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-13SenatePerfected
2019-03-13SenateSS, as amended, S adopted
2019-03-13SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(1276S06.21S)
2019-03-13SenateSA 1 to SS S defeated
2019-03-13SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S withdrawn
2019-03-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-05SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered (Hegeman)--(1276S06.16S)
2019-03-05SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Sifton)--(1276S06.13S)
2019-03-05SenateSS S offered (Hegeman)--(1276S.06F)
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-19SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 213-Hegeman
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback