MO SB21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12, 20, 21, 31, 56, 67 & 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12, 20, 21, 31, 56, 67 & 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public health
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12, 20, 21, 31, 56, 67 & 68) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |