MO SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to local sales taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to local sales taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 21 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 21 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 21 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 21 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseSigned by Governor
2019-05-17HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-17HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-17HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-15HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2019-05-15HouseHCS H Defeated
2019-05-15HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Merideth)--(0172H04.08H)
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-08HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-03-27HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-02-26HouseH Second Read
2019-02-25HouseH First Read
2019-02-21SenateS Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2019-02-19SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-18SenatePerfected, as amended
2019-02-18SenateSA 5 S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(0172S01.23S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 4 S offered & defeated (Koenig)--(0172S01.22S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 3 S defeated
2019-02-18SenateSA 1 to SA 3 S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(0172S01.14S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 3 S offered (Koenig)--(0172S01.05S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 2 S defeated
2019-02-18SenateSA 1 to SA 2 S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(0172S01.13S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 2 S offered (Koenig)--(0172S01.09S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 1, as amended, S adopted
2019-02-18SenateSA 1 to SA 1 S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0172S01.12S)
2019-02-18SenateSA 1 S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(0172S01.08S)
2019-02-07SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-06SenateVoted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-30SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 21-Libla
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback