MO SB21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires kindergarten attendance at the start of the school year for children who turn age five at any time during the calendar year
Title
Requires kindergarten attendance at the start of the school year for children who turn age five at any time during the calendar year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Education Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 21-Wright-Jones | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4065304 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB21.pdf |