MO SB207 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions pertaining to energy and property taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions pertaining to energy and property taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-13 H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (pending)
2011-05-05 Bill laid over
2011-05-05 HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2011-05-05 HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(1181L02.30H)
2011-05-05 HA 9 to HCS H offered (Riddle)--(1181L02.01H)
2011-05-05 HA 8 to HCS H adopted
2011-05-05 HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Wyatt)
2011-05-05 HA 8 to HCS H offered (Holsman)--(1181L02.05L)
2011-05-05 HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(1182L02.06H)
2011-05-05 HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2011-05-05 HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schneider)--(1181L02.26H)
2011-05-05 HA 6 to HCS H offered (Schoeller)--(1181L02.08H)
2011-05-05 HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fuhr)--(1181L02.15H)
2011-05-05 HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Schneider)--(1181L02.03H)
2011-05-05 HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(1181L02.12H)
2011-05-05 HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(1181L02.04H)
2011-05-05 HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(1181L02.01F)
2011-05-04 Placed back on Calendar
2011-05-04 Taken up for Third Reading
2011-05-04 HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-05-04 HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-04-26 Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-04-20 HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2011-04-20 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2011-04-13 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2011-04-13 HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee
2011-04-12 HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee
2011-04-05 Hearing Conducted H Utilities Committee
2011-03-31 Referred H Utilities Committee
2011-03-14 H Second Read
2011-03-10 H First Read
2011-03-10 S Third Read and Passed
2011-03-08 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2011-03-07 Perfected
2011-03-03 Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor
2011-02-23 Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2011-02-15 Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2011-02-07 Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2011-02-01 S First Read--SB 207-Lager

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback