MO SB206 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurers to file own risk and solvency assessment summary reports with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions, and Professional Registration
Title
Requires insurers to file own risk and solvency assessment summary reports with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions, and Professional Registration
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 206-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=870048 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB206.pdf |