MO SB201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 201-Dixon (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 201-Dixon (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the state's requirements to reimburse counties for certain costs related to imprisonment and electronic monitoring for criminal offenders
Title
Modifies the state's requirements to reimburse counties for certain costs related to imprisonment and electronic monitoring for criminal offenders
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 201-Dixon (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-11 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(1195S.02F) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 201-Dixon |