MO SB193 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurers to update their electronic and paper dental services provider materials available to plan members and potential members
Title
Requires health insurers to update their electronic and paper dental services provider materials available to plan members and potential members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 193-Wallingford |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57120922 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB193.pdf |