MO SB193 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-17 - Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-17 - Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Advisory Council on the Education of Gifted and Talented Children and requires the State Board of Education to designate a staff person in charge of gifted and talented education
Title
Establishes the Advisory Council on the Education of Gifted and Talented Children and requires the State Board of Education to designate a staff person in charge of gifted and talented education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | S First Read--SB 193-Schaefer |