MO SB190 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 190-Emery, with SCS & SS#2 for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to ratemaking for public utilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to ratemaking for public utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 190-Emery, with SCS & SS#2 for SCS (pending)
2017-03-29SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-29SenateTaken up for Perfection
2017-03-28SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-28SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered (Emery)--(0512S.10F)
2017-03-28SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2017-03-28SenateMotion to postpone debate on Part I of SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 until 10:00 a.m., March 29, 2017 (Schaaf)
2017-03-28SenateMotion to divide the question (SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1) granted (Schaaf)
2017-03-28SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-28SenateSA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Silvey)--(0512S09.07S)
2017-03-28SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Wallingford)--(0512S09.06S)
2017-03-28SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Emery)--(0512S09.05S)
2017-03-28SenateSS for SCS S offered (Emery)--(0512S.09F)
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS
2017-02-08SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0512S.05C)
2017-01-25SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2017-01-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 190-Emery and Nasheed
2016-12-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback