MO SB185 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Inormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 185-Onder, et al, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to transportation network companies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to transportation network companies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 185-Onder, et al, with SCS
2017-03-07SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2017-02-02SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0475S.05C)
2017-01-19SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 185-Onder, et al
2016-12-05SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback