MO SB184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 184-Wallingford with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended & HA 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 184-Wallingford with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended & HA 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workforce development
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workforce development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 (HA 1 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 47 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 (HA 1 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 47 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: SB 184 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 184-Wallingford with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended & HA 5 |
2019-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Motion to refer the bill to the Committee on Fiscal Review defeated (Merideth) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Hill)--(1142S02.35H) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(1142S02.43H) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 4 H offered (Roberts-77)--(1142S02.30H) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Coleman-32)--(1142S02.26H) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(1142S02.34H) |
2019-05-13 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(1142S02.07H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development |
2019-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development |
2019-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred H Workforce Development |
2019-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (1142S.02C) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 184-Wallingford |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled |