MO SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies a tax credit for certain financial institutions
Title
Modifies a tax credit for certain financial institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 175-Crawford |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=145574 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB175.pdf |