MO SB166 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends allocation of tax revenues from the nonresident entertainer and athlete tax until December 31, 2019
Title
Extends allocation of tax revenues from the nonresident entertainer and athlete tax until December 31, 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 166-Schaaf |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17272433 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB166.pdf |