MO SB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits motorcycle or motortricycle passengers under the age of eight
Title
Prohibits motorcycle or motortricycle passengers under the age of eight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |