MO SB165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset on the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Title
Extends the sunset on the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-04-27 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-11 | Referred H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-11 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-07 | H First Read | |
2011-04-07 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected | |
2011-04-04 | SCS S defeated | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-14 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent | |
2011-03-09 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - (0440S.02C) - Consent | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-01-25 | S First Read--SB 165-Goodman |