MO SB163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 163-Romine
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 163-Romine
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails
Title
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 163-Romine |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 163-Romine |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095365 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB163.pdf |