MO SB157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 157-Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 157-Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds language to jury instructions regarding lesser included offenses
Title
Adds language to jury instructions regarding lesser included offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 157-Dixon, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0354S.02C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 157-Dixon |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |