MO SB156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 156-Munzlinger, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 156-Munzlinger, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to animals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 156-Munzlinger, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0241S.04C) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 156-Munzlinger |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |