MO SB152 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 152-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR#2 and passed CCS#2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 152-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR#2 and passed CCS#2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to environmental protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to environmental protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | In Conference--SCS for SB 152-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR#2 and passed CCS#2) |
2015-05-06 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (0217S07.1SR) |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | H distributes CCR#2 (0217S07.1SR) |
2015-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Wallingford, Romine, Libla, Sifton, Holsman |
2015-05-04 | House | H conferees appointed: Miller, Smith, Nichols, Corlew, Hubrecht |
2015-05-04 | House | H grants further conference |
2015-05-04 | House | S requests H grant further conference |
2015-05-04 | House | S refuses to adopt CCR |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | CCR S offered (0217S06.1SR) - Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H distributes CCR (0217S06.1SR) |
2015-04-20 | House | H conferees appointed: Miller, Ross, Berry, Smith, Nichols |
2015-04-20 | House | S conferees appointed: Wallingford, Romine, Libla, Sifton, Holsman |
2015-04-20 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-04-20 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-20 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-16 | House | H refuses to recede & request S take up and pass bill |
2015-04-16 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-16 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lant)--(0217H04.03H) |
2015-04-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Miller)--(0217H04.02H) |
2015-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Energy and the Environment Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Energy and the Environment Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred H Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-11 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(0217S03.01S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor, with SCS |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0217S.03C) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 152-Wallingford |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled |