MO SB147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to motor vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to motor vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 147 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 147 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 147 (HA 12, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 147 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 147 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseCCS#2 H Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseH adopts CCR#2
2019-05-17SenateCCS#2 S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17SenateCCR#2 S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0387S09.1SR)
2019-05-17SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-17SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16SenateReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-16SenateH distributes CCR#2 (0387S09.1SR)
2019-05-16SenateHouse conferees appointed: Taylor, Eggleston, Roden, Bangert, Rogers
2019-05-16SenateSenate conferees appointed: Sater, Libla, Brown, Holsman, Williams
2019-05-16SenateS grants further conference
2019-05-16SenateH requests further conference
2019-05-16SenateH refuses to adopt CCR/CCS
2019-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0387S06.1SR)
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseH distributes CCR
2019-05-13HouseSenate conferees appointed: Sater, Libla, Brown, Holsman, Williams
2019-05-13HouseHouse conferees appointed: Taylor, Eggleston, Roden, Bangert, Rogers
2019-05-09HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-08HouseS refuses to concur in SCS for SB 147-Sater, with HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-08HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-08HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-08HouseMotion to refer the bill to the Committee on Fiscal Review defeated (Ellington)
2019-05-08HouseHA 12 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0387H03.19H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 12 to HCS H offered (Mayhew)--(0387H03.16H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 11 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Tate)--(0387H03.20H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 11 to HCS H offered (Griesheimer)--(0387H03.17H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Tate)--(0387H03.18H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bangert)--(0387H03.01H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(0387H03.02H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGirl)--(0387H03.10H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(0387H03.11H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Helms)--(0387H03.08H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(0387H03.13H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0387H03.09H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(0387H03.07H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bayse)--(0387H03.12H)
2019-05-08HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-16HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government
2019-04-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government
2019-04-08HouseHearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government
2019-04-03HouseReferred H Downsizing State Government
2019-03-27HouseH Second Read
2019-03-26HouseH First Read
2019-03-26SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-03-26SenateSCS S adopted
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS - Consent
2019-02-21SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted (0387S.02C)
2019-02-21SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0387S.02C)
2019-02-14SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-01-24SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 147-Sater
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=134
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB147.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/comm/SB147.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB147.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0147.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB147.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay400326550-568.pdf#558
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/065.023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/065.022.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/065.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.059.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.058.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback