MO SB140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0847S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0847S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for the sale of ethanol fuel
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for the sale of ethanol fuel
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0847S.02C) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |