MO SB132 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to receive state aid for children ages three to five participating in a district-operated pre-kindergarten program
Title
Allows school districts to receive state aid for children ages three to five participating in a district-operated pre-kindergarten program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | S First Read--SB 132-Keaveny and Holsman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17170303 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB132.pdf |