MO SB13 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 13-Schaefer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 13-Schaefer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates solid waste management districts and reduces landfill tipping fees by the amount previously used on district overhead and administration
Title
Eliminates solid waste management districts and reduces landfill tipping fees by the amount previously used on district overhead and administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 13-Schaefer, with SCS |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (0185S.03C) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 13-Schaefer |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |