MO SB13 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Joint Committee on Education to oversee a task force on teacher compensation and effectiveness
Title
Requires the Joint Committee on Education to oversee a task force on teacher compensation and effectiveness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2011-02-28 | H Second Read | |
2011-02-24 | H First Read | |
2011-02-24 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Perfected | |
2011-02-22 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-02-22 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Green)--(0316S05.01S) | |
2011-02-22 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Lager)--(0316S05.02S) | |
2011-02-22 | SS for SCS S offered (Pearce)--(0316S.05F) | |
2011-02-17 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-02-09 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0316S.04C) | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 13-Pearce | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |