MO SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tobacco products
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tobacco products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |