MO SB122 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Referred H Health Insurance Committee
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Referred H Health Insurance Committee
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health insurance as it applies prescription drug co-payments and the establishment of web-based estimating systems for use by consumers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health insurance as it applies prescription drug co-payments and the establishment of web-based estimating systems for use by consumers
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Referred H Health Insurance Committee | |
2011-05-02 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-28 | H First Read | |
2011-04-28 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-04-06 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-04-06 | SS for SCS S withdrawn | |
2011-04-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(0757S.04F) | |
2011-03-31 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-02-22 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee - (0757S.02C) | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-18 | S First Read--SB 122-Schaaf |