MO SB1156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds vehicles operated by county or municipal park rangers to the definition of "emergency vehicle"
Title
Adds vehicles operated by county or municipal park rangers to the definition of "emergency vehicle"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | S First Read |